|
06/20/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-265, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239)
|
|
|
|
06/19/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Substituted for HB 5301
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 03/21/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|