LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S7030
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S7030
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S7030
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 21, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 4, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 17, 2023
Analysis
May 9, 2023
Analysis
March 29, 2023
Analysis
March 27, 2023
Analysis
March 21, 2023
Analysis
March 20, 2023
Prefiled
Bill
March 16, 2023
Compare