|
06/22/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-269
|
|
|
|
06/20/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Regulated Industries
|
|
|