Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Prefiled

Bill March 24, 2023