Senate | 05/03/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1091 (Ch. 2023-68) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Substituted HB 1091 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Submitted for consideration by Regulated Industries |