Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Prefiled

Bill March 30, 2023