Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7041 (Ch. 2023-200), CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2023-173)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 7041
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
|
|
|