Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Prefiled

Bill March 30, 2023