|
06/01/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-172
|
|
|
|
05/31/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (543692)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance
|
|
|