LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S7052
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S7052
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S7052
Compare Versions
S7052 Enrolled May 4, 2023
S7052 Engrossed April 26, 2023
S7052 Comm Sub April 24, 2023
S7052 Introduced April 5, 2023
S7052 Prefiled March 31, 2023
Version 1 (Old)
S7052 Enrolled May 4, 2023
S7052 Engrossed April 26, 2023
S7052 Comm Sub April 24, 2023
S7052 Introduced April 5, 2023
S7052 Prefiled March 31, 2023
Version 2 (New)
Compare