Senate | 05/02/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2023-77) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Substituted HB 7061 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Referred to Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |