Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023

Prefiled

Bill April 6, 2023