House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Finance and Tax; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Submitted for consideration by Finance and Tax |