Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023

Prefiled

Bill April 13, 2023