|
05/17/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-86
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (621725)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 621725 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (281172)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Fiscal Policy
|
|
|