Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023

Prefiled

Bill April 17, 2023