House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/05/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|