Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024