|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-25
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (679511)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 76, NAYS 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Concurred in Senate amendment 407902 as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Amendment 679511 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (407902)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (736582)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Rules (736582); YEAS 15 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 80, NAYS 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 684503 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 547001 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 693245 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 042703 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 301331 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 505305 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 466201 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 503451 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 291969 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment 291251 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|