LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0049
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0049
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0049
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
September 18, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 12, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 12, 2024
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
March 27, 2024
Analysis
March 12, 2024
Analysis
March 8, 2024
Analysis
February 27, 2024
Analysis
February 23, 2024
Analysis
January 24, 2024
Analysis
January 19, 2024
Analysis
January 11, 2024
Analysis
January 8, 2024
Analysis
December 14, 2023
Analysis
December 11, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
January 11, 2024
Compare
Bill
December 14, 2023
Compare