House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|