Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 19, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024