House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Filed |