|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-26
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Substituted for SB 520
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/7/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|