Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0083 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 9, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis November 15, 2023
Analysis November 13, 2023