|
06/24/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-256
|
|
|
|
06/21/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/07/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 83, NAYS 28
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 542244 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 24 NAYS 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (542244)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 632
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 88, NAYS 29
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|