Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0087 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis December 12, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 30, 2024