House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|