Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0095 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis November 16, 2023
Analysis November 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill November 16, 2023