House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2023
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|