Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0115 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis December 14, 2023
Analysis December 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill December 14, 2023