Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2024