House
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message received
|
|
|
|
06/26/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted for SB 42
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment 063309 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|