Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis November 8, 2023
Analysis November 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024