Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024