House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|