Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis February 24, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024