House
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message received
|
|
|
|
06/26/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Original reference removed: Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
PCS added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|