Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0165 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 28, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024