House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1224
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|