Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0185 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis December 8, 2023
Analysis December 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill December 8, 2023