|
05/07/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-148
|
|
|
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 896
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
PCS added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|