Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis December 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2024
Bill December 7, 2023