|
04/03/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-50
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 222
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Original reference removed: Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|