Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024