House
|
02/29/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 364
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Substituted SB 364
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Favorable by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|