Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0229 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 24, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis November 15, 2023
Analysis November 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2024