House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Filed |