|
04/08/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-64
|
|
|
|
04/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 800572 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (800572)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 388
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|