Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024